RI H5127 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Middletown, upon receiving a request for the abandonment of a highway from an abutting property owner, to buy the abandoned highway from the abutting owner, at fair market value.
Title
Abandonment Of Roads
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2021-06-15 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2021) |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |