RI H5125 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from state taxation certain pension benefits that originate from, and were taxed in another state.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5125.pdf |