RI H5121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases insurance coverage for hearing aids from one thousand five hundred dollars ($1,500) to two thousand dollars ($2,000), per ear, every three years. In addition, the amount of insurance coverage would no longer be based on the age of the recipient.
Title
Hearing Aids
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019) |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5121.pdf |