RI H5117 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes to the sentencing and execution guidelines for purposes of criminal procedure and would add new conditions of criminal probation.
Title
Sentence And Execution
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-09-14 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (09/15/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2017) |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |