RI H5116 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the director of the department of environmental management to recognize and identify public rights-of-way to shoreline and water access over land owned by a private party.
Title
Shore Development
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Brandon Potter [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2023) |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5116.pdf |