RI H5114 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines and prohibits dismemberment abortions with certain exceptions.
Title
The Rhode Island Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2019) |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5114.pdf |