RI H5113 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the use of fax or email transmission of the medical certificate required for issuance of a CDL by the division of motor vehicles.
Title
Commercial Driver's License
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2017) |
2017-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5113.pdf |