RI H5111 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it a felony to price gouge prescriptions or pharmaceuticals in time of a shortage.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions -- Price Gouging Of Prescription Drugs Prohibited
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023) |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5111.pdf |