RI H5111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes state aide to RICAP for training/equipment for use during times of natural disaster/emergency as needed by state EMA/governor.
Title
Civil Air Patrol Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5111.pdf |