RI H5106 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations (would Establish The E-verify Compliance Chapter. It Would Also Require All Non-governmental Employers Within The State With Three (3) Or More Employees To Apply To Participate In The E-verify Program And To Participate If Accepted)
Title
An Act Relating To Labor And Labor Relations (would Establish The E-verify Compliance Chapter. It Would Also Require All Non-governmental Employers Within The State With Three (3) Or More Employees To Apply To Participate In The E-verify Program And To Participate If Accepted)
Sponsors
Rep. Doreen Costa [R] | Rep. Peter Palumbo [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Joseph Trillo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2013) |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5106.pdf |