RI H5105 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Innovation, Internet, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a statewide broadband community outreach coordinator to assist state residents interested in learning more and/or applying for the federal Affordable Connectivity Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband Deployment And Investment Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-04-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2023)
2023-02-25HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (03/02/2023)
2023-02-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2023-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Innovation, Internet, & Technology

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback