RI H5101 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the imposition of up to a $500 fine on a motor vehicle lessor or secured party for failing to follow proper procedures in the event of a default by a lessee or purchaser.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions - The Rhode Island Automobile Repossession Act
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/22/2017) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2017) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-01 | House | House read and passed |
2017-01-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/01/2017) |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-01-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (01/24/2017) |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/18/2017) |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |