RI H5100 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines and regulates, and in some cases, prohibit dismemberment abortions.
Title
Abortion -- The Rhode Island Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5100.pdf |