RI H5095 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits price-gouging of prescribed drugs or pharmaceuticals in times of market emergency or market shortages and makes violators guilty of a felony and subject to injunctive relief.
Title
Unfair Sales Practices
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
Rep. Moira Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/29/2019) |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5095.pdf |