RI H5092 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Scott Avedisian to join Jennifer Elizabeth Sayles and Mary-Margaret Velan in marriage on or about February 15, 2017, within the City of Warwick, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-26 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-02-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/07/2017) |
2017-01-26 | House | House read and passed |
2017-01-24 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (01/26/2017) |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-01-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/18/2017) |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |