RI H5091 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the office of inspector general as an independent administrative agency charged with the responsibility to prevent and detect fraud, waste, abuse, and mismanagement in the expenditure of public funds.
Title
Establishing An Office Of Inspector General
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Lancia [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Kenneth Mendonca [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017) |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5091.pdf |