RI H5090 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits a covered establishment from preparing, selling, processing or providing food or beverages in or on a disposable food service container that is composed in whole or in part of polystyrene foam.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposable Food Service Containers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-22HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-15SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2023-06-13SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-13HouseHouse passed Sub A
2023-06-09HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2023)
2023-06-07HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-06-02HouseProposed Substitute
2023-06-02HouseScheduled for consideration (06/07/2023)
2023-03-23HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2023)
2023-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback