RI H5087 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-01 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-01 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses - Assaults: would provide that choking or strangling another person would be a felony assault, whether or not the choking or strangling results in serious bodily injury
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses - Assaults
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Roberto DaSilva [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] |
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2011-05-25 | House passed Sub A | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-08 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-01 | Meeting postponed | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-01-26 | Meeting postponed | |
2011-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5087.pdf |