RI H5081 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a Wine Direct Shipper License enabling licensed producers to directly ship wine to eligible residents.
Title
Wine Direct Shipper License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2015) |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5081.pdf |
Roll Call | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=7619 |