RI H5078 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the period of time required for occupancy for transient lodging accommodations from 30 days to 6 days.
Title
Relating To State Affairs And Government
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. John Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017) |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5078.pdf |