RI H5078 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that any genetically-engineered foods be labeled as such.
Title
Genetically Engineered Food
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Karen Macbeth [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2015) |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5078.pdf |