RI H5076 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-15 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the state to become a member of the physical therapist licensure compact adopted by twenty-five (25) states in order to facilitate the interstate practice of physical therapy with the goal of improving public access to physical therapy services.
Title
Rhode Island Physical Therapist Licensure Compact Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2023-04-20 | House | House read and passed |
2023-04-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/20/2023) |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2023) |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2023) |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |