RI H5073 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Stephen C. Bailey to join Abigail Rachel Bailey and Michael Joseph Parker in marriage on or about August 10, 2015, within the Town of Portsmouth, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-03-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/12/2015) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2015) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | House | House read and passed |
2015-01-20 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (02/03/2015) |
2015-01-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/20/2015) |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |