RI H5070 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals (bhddh) To Fully Address All Previous Violations And Take All Necessary Actions To Ensure Ongoing Compliance With The Federal Mental Health Parity And Addiction Equity Act Of 2008 (requesting The Ri Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals To Address All Previous Violations And Take Necessary Actions To Ensure Compliance With The Federal Mental Health Parity And Addiction Equity Act Of 2008)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals (bhddh) To Fully Address All Previous Violations And Take All Necessary Actions To Ensure Ongoing Compliance With The Federal Mental Health Parity And Addiction Equity Act Of 2008 (requesting The Ri Department Of Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals To Address All Previous Violations And Take Necessary Actions To Ensure Compliance With The Federal Mental Health Parity And Addiction Equity Act Of 2008)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-01-29HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2021)
2021-01-29HouseCommittee transferred to House Health & Human Services
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback