RI H5069 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires all charter public schools actively recruit students from and in every district that the school is chartered to service and receive students from.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equitable Access For All Students Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/10/2021)
2021-02-02HouseCommittee transferred to House Education
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback