RI H5068 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school committees to provide transportation for any student who resides two (2) or more miles from school.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2019) |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5068.pdf |