RI H5068 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-18 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/20/2017)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-18 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/20/2017)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates the display of "year of manufacture plates" for motor vehicles more than 25 years old.
Title
Definitions And General Code Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-18 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (06/20/2017) |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5068.pdf |