RI H5062 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the trapping and subsequent release of any unowned feral or free roaming cat for the purpose of spaying or neutering of the cat shall not be considered abandonment.
Title
Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2019-05-01 | House | House read and passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/01/2019) |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/27/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019) |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |