RI H5060 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a motor vehicle accident with death resulting, if the attorney general decides not to prosecute a criminal case, the attorney general shall give the decedent's representatives an opportunity to discuss why the matter is not being prosecuted.
Title
Victim's Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017) |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5060.pdf |