RI H5059 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Delete a portion of the enabling statute for the Bristol County Water Authority.
Title
Bristol County Water Supply
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2021) |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2021-06-08 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2021) |
2021-06-03 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-01 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2021) |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |