RI H5057 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the minimum wage to ten dollars and fifty cents ($10.50) commencing July 1, 2017.
Title
Minimum Wage
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2017) |
2017-02-08 | House | Meeting postponed (02/09/2017) |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5057.pdf |