RI H5054 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2021 And 2022 (amends Section (45)(d) Of The House Rules Regarding Caucuses Organized Around A Political Party Affiliation And Membership Thereto.)
Title
House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2021 And 2022 (amends Section (45)(d) Of The House Rules Regarding Caucuses Organized Around A Political Party Affiliation And Membership Thereto.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Brien [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] |
Rep. Brian Rea [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-01-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/18/2023) |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Rules Committee |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5054.pdf |