RI H5054 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And The Design Of A Beirut Memorial To Be Located At The Rhode Island State House (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And The Design Of A Beirut Memorial Located At The Rhode Island State House To April 30, 2020, And Would Expire On May 30, 2020.)
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And The Design Of A Beirut Memorial To Be Located At The Rhode Island State House (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And The Design Of A Beirut Memorial Located At The Rhode Island State House To April 30, 2020, And Would Expire On May 30, 2020.)
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | House read and passed |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/13/2019) |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2019) |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |