RI H5053 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-11 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows persons who are involuntarily unemployed and are subject to license or registration non-renewal as a result of failure to pay taxes to obtain a conditional renewal during their period of unemployment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
2015-06-10HouseHouse passed Sub A
2015-06-05HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/10/2015)
2015-06-02HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2015-05-29HouseScheduled for consideration (06/02/2015)
2015-02-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2015-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2015)
2015-01-26HouseMeeting postponed (01/27/2015)
2015-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback