RI H5051 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the Honor and Remember flag as Rhode Island's emblem for service and sacrifice of members in the United States armed forces.
Title
Monuments And Memorials
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Robert Lancia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-02-07 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/09/2017) |
2017-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5051.pdf |