RI H5049 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Places a cap of twenty percent (20%) on increases in consecutive revaluations of real property in all cities and towns conducting revaluations commencing December 31, 2023, and every December 31 thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2023)
2023-01-11HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback