RI H5049 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs council on elementary and secondary education to recommend to the commissioner of education a curriculum that allows students successful careers in computer science.
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2017) |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5049.pdf |