RI H5047 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the police officer commission on standards and training to establish mandatory training standards for police officers and trainees in all incidents involving mental health literacy.
Title
Commission On Standards And Training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2017-01-30 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/01/2017) |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5047.pdf |