RI H5044 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting Date Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As "growing Tourism In The State Of Rhode Island"
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting Date Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As "growing Tourism In The State Of Rhode Island"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2019) |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5044.pdf |