RI H5043 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-13 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-13 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that adjunct faculty members at any state college or university who teach at least 50% of the hours regularly worked by full-time faculty in a semester would be eligible for the same medical benefits as other state employees.
Title
Insurance Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | House | House passed Sub A |
2023-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2023) |
2023-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-06-10 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-06-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2023) |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2023) |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |