RI H5042 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires planning board members to receive training on issues related to development in flood plains and the effects of sea level rise.
Title
Local Planning Board Or Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/22/2017) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-05-16 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-05-05 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/16/2017) |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/19/2017) |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |