RI H5041 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires drug manufactures to establish fund and manage state approved drug take back programs, free of charge to the consumer and pharmacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Food And Drugs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2021)
2021-02-09HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2021)
2021-02-02HouseCommittee transferred to House Health & Human Services
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback