RI H5040 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of certain fireworks, other than by lawfully issued permit, anytime other than between the dates of June 30 and July 9.
Title
Explosives And Fireworks
Sponsors
Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2017) |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5040.pdf |