RI H5037 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Adopting The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2019 And 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Adopting The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2019 And 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 27 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 28 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 23 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 22 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-01-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (01/16/2019)
2019-01-10HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-01-08HouseScheduled for consideration (01/10/2019)
2019-01-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-01-04HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/08/2019)
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced, referred to House Rules Committee

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback