RI H5037 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-16 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Adopting The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2019 And 2020
Title
House Resolution Adopting The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2019 And 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 27 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 28 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 23 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 22 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 28 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 23 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 22 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-01-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (01/16/2019) |
2019-01-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-01-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (01/10/2019) |
2019-01-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/08/2019) |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Rules Committee |