RI H5035 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-27 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-27 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the synthetic opioid U-47700 (3,4-dichloro-N-[2-dimethylamino)cyclohexyl]-N-methylbenzamidem) to the list of Schedule I controlled substances as enumerated in ยง21-28-2.08 of the general laws.
Title
Relating To Food And Drugs-uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Committee heard |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/22/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | House | House read and passed |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/28/2017) |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-02-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/14/2017) |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2017) |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |