RI H5034 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the governor to designate any person to solemnize a marriage within the state of Rhode Island on a particular day and within a particular city or town.
Title
Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2021) |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-10 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2021) |
2021-06-02 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-28 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2021) |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2021) |
2021-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |