RI H5033 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Mandates that a program of financial literacy be taught to all students in the public high schools throughout the state of Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Literacy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateReferred to Senate Education
2019-06-24HouseHouse passed Sub A
2019-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/24/2019)
2019-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2019-06-17HouseProposed Substitute
2019-06-14HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2019)
2019-03-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2019)
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback