RI H5032 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all public utilities to maintain a customer service facility within the state to perform services such as addressing customer inquiries and accepting bill payments.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2023-05-16 | House | House read and passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/16/2023) |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2023) |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2023) |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |