RI H5032 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]


Prohibits price-gouging of prescribed drugs or pharmaceuticals in times of market emergency or market shortages and makes violators guilty of a felony and subject to injunctive relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Unfair Sales Practices



2017-01-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-01-20HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2017)
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations


Rhode Island State Sources

Bill Comments